BWLCH-Y-CIBAU RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 524400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

maintain upkeep of recreation ground maintain upkeep of hall interior provide public with facilities for meetings and outdoor events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,126
Total expenditure: £4,429

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER EDWARD LEWIS Chair
None on record
REV Hermione Morris Trustee 13 May 2014
None on record
MR WYNNE MORRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.62k £14.08k £1.33k £3.80k £5.13k
Total expenditure £4.04k £4.10k £8.44k £4.80k £4.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 April 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLANLLYN
LLANFYLLIN
SY22 5LY
Phone:
01691648417
Website:

No information available