Trustees LLANDINAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 524410

Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Watson | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Blayney | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karl Lewis | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqeline Ann Moss | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kris Taylor | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JONES | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Deakins | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Cook | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Murphy | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Anderson | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wheately | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Carter | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Beaman | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brennan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ann Vaughan | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Brooks | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Morgan | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JACKSON | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.