Financial history MEIFOD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.45k £7.13k £16.38k £15.19k £12.98k
Total expenditure £15.03k £11.09k £13.32k £14.57k £22.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A £8.00k £1.60k N/A