THE HAVERFORDWEST PUBLIC SWIMMING POOL

Charity number: 524434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The operation of a swimming pool for the benefit of the inhabitants of & visitors to Haverfordwest & the surrounding area, in particular for classes and instruction in swimming and similar aquatic skills and for healthy recreation and other forms of leisure time occupation with the object of improving the condition of life for the said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,894
Total expenditure: £44,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER MARTIN Chair
None on record
Cheryl Heidi Lewis Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Richard James Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Rob Simister Trustee 25 July 2022
None on record
Gelly James Trustee 25 July 2022
None on record
Jonathan Twigg Trustee 23 July 2021
None on record
David Bryan Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record
Michael John Trustee 09 March 2018
THE LLANGWM VILLAGE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Tim Evans Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record
Thomas Tudor Trustee
ADAM'S BUCKETFUL OF HOPE APPEAL LTD
Received: On time
PEMBROKESHIRE COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.18k £20.46k £20.83k £21.24k £21.89k
Total expenditure £17.49k £9.20k £7.63k £30.69k £44.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 August 2024 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Greenfield Close
HAVERFORDWEST
Pembrokeshire
SA61 2QJ
Phone:
07792673166
Website:

No information available