Accounts and annual returns MILFORD YOUTH MATTERS

Charity number: 524441
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 February 2025 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 February 2025 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 July 2023 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 July 2023 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 August 2022 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 August 2022 197 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window