Financial history MILFORD YOUTH MATTERS

Charity number: 524441
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £193.99k £283.97k £107.99k £150.21k £157.20k
Total expenditure £147.50k £191.05k £133.60k £137.27k £129.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.92k
Income from government grants N/A £19.50k £17.45k £58.18k £40.92k