MILFORD YOUTH MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 14 AND 25 LIVING IN MILFORD HAVEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,917 from 3 government contract(s) and £40,917 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 09 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE MILFORD HAVEN SOCIAL SERVICE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Lynn King | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Farmer | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS CHARLTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.99k | £283.97k | £107.99k | £150.21k | £157.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.50k | £191.05k | £133.60k | £137.27k | £129.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £40.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.50k | £17.45k | £58.18k | £40.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 26/02/1936 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/03/1951 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 AND 25 LIVING IN MILFORD HAVEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS THEREBY ENHANCING THEIR EMPLOYABILITY. (B) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF IMPROVING HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MILFORD HAVEN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL VIEW
ROSEMARKET
MILFORD HAVEN
SA73 1JF
- Phone:
- 07599 653986
- Email:
- cecmym@outlook.com
- Website:
-
milfordyouthmatters.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window