MILFORD HAVEN UNIT 564 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Sea Cadet Corps is to give young people the best possible head start in life through nautical adventure and fun based on the customs and traditions of the Royal Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £81,697 from 17 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 14 May 1963: Standard registration
- T.S HARRIER (Working name)
- UNIT NO 242 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- UNIT NUMBER 564 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN SHARP | Chair | 24 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Aled Lee Davies MNI | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hannah Karpaty | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Jarrett | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Spice | Trustee | 02 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Spice | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Anderson | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Garland | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.41k | £131.59k | £136.68k | £70.13k | £118.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.23k | £93.42k | £89.08k | £108.83k | £114.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | N/A | £81.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Milford Haven Sea Cadets
Unit A
Havens Head Business Park
Hakin
MILFORD HAVEN
SA73 3LD
- Phone:
- 01646695443
- Email:
- co@milfordhavenscc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window