BRADFORD PRODUCING HUB LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2019, Bradford Producing Hub (BPH) tests radical new approaches to producing work, supporting talent, and developing a thriving local arts sector. BPH supports creatives and arts organisations through funding, mentoring, training, development, and networking opportunities to platform Bradford as a district that nurtures and celebrates homegrown talent.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN WATSON | Chair | 24 October 2023 |
|
|||||
David John Glanville | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thorp | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Highett | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Urussa Malik | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Mytton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Robert Croft | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY WITHIN BRADFORD BUT ALSO IN THE REST OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (1) DEVELOPING, PRODUCING AND PROMOTING CREATIVE AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, (2) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT, PRODUCTION AND PROMOTION OF CREATIVE AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND (3) FOSTERING ACCESS TO, PARTICIPATION IN AND ENGAGEMENT WITH CREATIVE AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASSEMBLY BRADFORD
20 NORTH PARADE
BRADFORD
BD1 3HT
- Phone:
- 07741437053
- Email:
- hello@bdproducinghub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.