THE PEMBROKESHIRE FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pembrokeshire YFC seeks to fulfill the potential of rural young people through education, training and social programmes that develop their personal skills, encourage community involvement and concern for the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
175 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 28 July 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terrie Jo Savage | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomos Gwern Lewis | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD PERKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.97k | £107.10k | £57.79k | £79.98k | £108.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.16k | £82.73k | £54.56k | £73.12k | £102.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £655 | £20.00k | £14.52k | £7.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST OCTOBER 1959, AS AMENDED 10TH NOVERMBER, 1971.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; AND B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF PEMBROKE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pembrokeshire YFC Office
Agriculture House
Winch Lane
HAVERFORDWEST
Dyfed
SA61 1RW
- Phone:
- 01437762639
- Email:
- sir.benfro@yfc-wales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window