Trustees AFRO-ASIA LEARNING INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1212772
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Hussain Ibrahim Saleh Chair 08 February 2025
None on record
Hoda Mear-Mosaway Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Zainab Hussain Ibrahim Trustee 05 March 2025
None on record
Muhammad Ibrahim Al-Shahristani Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Reza Shahrestani Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record