Financial history 1ST ROBERTSFORD (ST GILES) GROUP

Charity number: 524496
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £3.47k £5.10k £6.38k £9.97k £8.10k
Total expenditure £3.65k £6.38k £6.52k £9.94k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A