1ST ROBERTSFORD (ST GILES) GROUP

Charity Number: 524496
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cub Scout Beaver and Guide group activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011

Total income: £8,101
Total expenditure: £8,482

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1971: Standard registration
  • 14 March 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • FIRST/1ST ROBERTSFORD SCOUT ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £3.47k £5.10k £6.38k £9.97k £8.10k
Total expenditure £3.65k £6.38k £6.52k £9.94k £8.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required