SHROPSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Shropshire County Scout Council is to further the work of the Scout Association in Shropshire by encouraging the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
855 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
- Shropshire Scouts (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Shelmerdine | Chair | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Turpin | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Windler | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Charles Williams | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Hulme | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Franklin | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PARKES | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hodge | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|||||
John Stuart Rutherford | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.56k | £26.52k | £20.76k | £23.31k | £46.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £10.49k | £24.68k | £20.72k | £36.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 13TH JUNE 1958 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
SHROPSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 26th Shrewsbury Scout HQ
Field Crescent
Shrewsbury
SY1 4PW
- Phone:
- 07805722893
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window