1ST CHADSMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Training and development of young people - Outdoor activities, ie camping abseiling etc., and life skills incorporated in badge work

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,625
Total expenditure: £21,899

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 October 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW BEARD Chair
None on record
Jade Alexandra Barley Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
MRS M ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.80k £19.24k £23.96k £9.65k £9.63k
Total expenditure £10.35k £5.67k £7.08k £8.94k £21.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.05k £18.85k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 May 2024 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 WALNUT DRIVE
CANNOCK
WS11 6NF
Phone:
01543505357
Website:

No information available