Trustees 15th Walsall (2nd Brownhills) Scout Group

Charity number: 524548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lee James Bragginton Chair 17 May 2018
38TH WALSALL (1ST WALSALL WOOD) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Tonya Foster Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Hayley Hasketh Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Susan Barbara Wright Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Lynn Mary Gamble Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Dr Andrew Feilden Trustee 24 November 2017
None on record