113TH BIRMINGHAM (1ST ARIEL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 524567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scout group with Squirrel, Beaver, Cub and Scout sections.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £28,126
Total expenditure: £23,157

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ARIEL SCOUTS (Working name)
  • FIRST ARIEL SCOUT GROUP (113TH BIRMINGHAM) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Moody Chair 04 June 2017
None on record
GERARD AIREY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.25k £24.61k £41.48k £26.79k £28.13k
Total expenditure £8.12k £8.04k £43.84k £26.76k £23.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.74k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
41 NORTHFIELD ROAD
KINGS NORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B30 1JD
Phone:
07882222582