PARK PALACE PONIES CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 26 September 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Owens | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Scott | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McNally | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Mitchell | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Christina Allen-Rudkin | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 26 SEP 2024 AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS: TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HORSE AND PONY RIDING AND ASSOCIATED SKILLS (E.G. PONY CARE AND STABLE MANAGEMENT) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF HORSE AND PONY RIDING IN LIVERPOOL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF HORSE AND PONY RIDING. TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF EQUINE MANAGEMENT AND HOW INTERACTION WITH EQUINES CAN BENEFIT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Palace Ponies
253 Mill Street
Liverpool
L8 6QN
- Phone:
- 01517080624
- Email:
- parkpalaceponies@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.