Trustees PARK PALACE PONIES CIO

Charity number: 1210233
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Debbie Owens Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Karen Scott Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Stephen McNally Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Guy Mitchell Trustee 27 September 2024
None on record
Pamela Christina Allen-Rudkin Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record