Financial history 3RD COVENTRY SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 524575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.49k £47.36k £32.87k £111.35k £102.18k
Total expenditure £64.04k £18.76k £45.86k £49.73k £78.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.67k £10.67k N/A N/A