CITY OF COVENTRY SCOUT COUNTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The City of Coventry Scout County provides leadership, advice and support for Scout Districts and, through them, Scout Groups in Coventry. The principle of Scouting is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens & as members of their local, national & international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
508 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
- COVENTRY SCOUTS (Working name)
- CITY OF COVENTRY SCOUTS COUNTY (Previous name)
- COVENTRY BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Bennett | Chair | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Tooth | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Tooth | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rendall | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Cox | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lee | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Luke Adrian FitzPackham | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Tansey | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ROBERT STAPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE PITHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.62k | £63.12k | £167.32k | £210.26k | £486.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.40k | £104.14k | £188.01k | £203.42k | £224.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rough Close
Tanners Lane
Berkswell
Coventry
CV7 7DD
- Phone:
- 02476464310
- Email:
- scoutcov3@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window