7TH RUGBY(BILTON)SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the UK's biggest mixed youth organisation. We change lives by offering 6 to 25-year-olds fun and challenging activities, unique experiences, everyday adventure and the chance to help others so that we make a positive impact in communities. Scout group-Beaver's Colony 6-8 yrs, Cub Pack 8-10.5 yrs, Scout Troop 10.5-14 yrs. Explorer Scouts 15-18 yrs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 October 2010: Standard registration
- 7TH RUGBY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Dickens | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Oliver | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke Thomas Parry | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Cresswell | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Coral Anne Louise Parmee | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS ROY PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £22.73k | £30.64k | £20.49k | £19.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.18k | £10.94k | £20.45k | £43.75k | £23.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1957 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
7TH RUGBY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
RUGBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 BESWICK GARDENS
RUGBY
CV22 7PR
- Phone:
- 01788813477
- Email:
- kj.dickens@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window