DREAM CATCHER TRAVEL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Overseas respite trips for families with children that have autism, other disabilities and life limiting illnesses.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Croydon
Governance
- 24 December 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Hinds-Grant | Chair | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Johnston | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Grant | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pometsy | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Philip Small | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Geraldine Heslop | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO FAMILIES PREDOMINANTLY LIVING IN THE BROMLEY AND CROYDON AREA BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WHO ARE RAISING A CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON WITH A LONG-TERM DISABILITY, DISABLING CONDITION OR LIFE-LIMITING ILLNESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FAMILY HOLIDAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 AYLESFORD AVENUE
BECKENHAM
BR3 3SB
- Phone:
- 07709 177557
- Email:
- Info@dreamcatcher.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.