1st Shottery Scout Group

Charity Number: 524604
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SCOUT GROUP PROVIDING SCOUTING ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AGES 6 TO 15 IN STRATFORD UPON AVON

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £32,013
Total expenditure: £35,151

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST SHOTTERY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EMMA LUCY HASLAM Chair 14 November 2018
None on record
Toni Alexis Monkhouse Trustee 31 December 2021
None on record
Alexander james Maddox Trustee 06 July 2018
None on record
Rob Farquharson Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.77k £23.94k £24.63k £24.57k £32.01k
Total expenditure £24.96k £15.63k £23.18k £27.68k £35.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.14k £11.17k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 March 2025 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 March 2025 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 May 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
79 Shottery Road
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 9QQ
Phone:
07964880695
Website:

No information available