EDENVALE TRUST

Charity number: 1209834
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide grants to support registered charities, enhancing their ability to deliver services that align with our mission. We prioritise smaller, grassroots organisations to maximise community impact.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 September 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • The Achieve Foundation (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TINA AKANDE Chair 01 July 2024
None on record
Mosun Jerugba Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Francis Okeke Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Ajibola Aroyehun Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Adekunle Akande Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
548-550 ELDER HOUSE
OFFICE 202 ELDER GATE
MILTON KEYNES
ENGLAND
MK9 1LR
Phone:
01908759406
Website:

No information available