Financial history Avon Vale District Scout Council

Charity number: 524623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.58k £2.39k £5.95k £47.27k £21.07k
Total expenditure £37.94k £3.22k £4.45k £12.38k £25.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.60k