16TH WYRE FOREST (STOURPORT ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting has been in existence for 100 years and St Michaels was the first Scout Group within the Stourport area. The purpose of Scouting is to promote the development of young people (aged 6 to 14) in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 31 August 1967: Standard registration
- ST MICHAELS SCOUT GROUP STOURPORT (Working name)
- FIRST STOURPORT ST MICHAELS GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK GOULD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Felicity Margaret Marshall | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Soames | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Victoria Wilton | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Atkinson | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS JOHN CLEWES | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MEL GOULD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEMMA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIERAN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.13k | £20.55k | £15.24k | £7.66k | £8.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £6.02k | £12.34k | £13.53k | £12.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JANUARY 1948 as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
BOY SCOUT GROUP (UNIT OFTHE SCOUT ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
16th Wyre Forest Scout Hut
Mitton Close
STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN
Worcestershire
DY13 9AD
- Phone:
- 01299878718
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window