Abbey Hill Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to produce young people who are able to be a full part of there local, national and international communities. we do this by offering a exciting and interesting programme of education and activities that are geared towards how we view ourselves and interact with other people and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
Governance
- 10 June 1965: Standard registration
- 1ST WARLEY WOODS SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 292ND BIRMINGHAM, 1ST WARLEY WOODS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Wright | Chair | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Waldron | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Clowes | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Waldron | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hadley | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Hadley | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Andrews | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.95k | £22.88k | £18.62k | £8.35k | £9.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £7.53k | £9.90k | £6.68k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.48k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND NOVEMBER, 1961 as amended on 31 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
292ND BIRMINGHAM, 1ST WARLEY WOODS GROUP
Area of benefit
SMETHWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Jackson Drive
Smethwick
B67 7RG
- Phone:
- 07875305167
- Email:
- philwright@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window