WELLS COMMUNITY NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wells Community Network supports those in need in Wells and surrounding areas through signposting, information, and practical help. It combats social exclusion by assisting individuals facing hardship, ill health, age-related challenges, or other barriers to integration. WCN fosters inclusion and well-being, ensuring access to vital resources and services.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 February 2025: CIO registration
- WCN (Working name)
- WELLS COMMUNITY NETWORK CIC (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Elizabeth Leigh | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Annalisa Checchi | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Webb | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Deverell MBE | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howard Pottinger | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Fairnington Welch | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Lefevre | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Maria Lawler | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SIGNPOSTING, PROVIDING INFORMATION, PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES WHICH THE TRUSTEES DECIDE ARE CONSISTENT WITH THIS CHARITABLE PURPOSE. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE LIVING IN WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); BEING A REFUGEE OR AN ASYLUM SEEKER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Churchill Road East
WELLS
BA5 3HU
- Phone:
- 01749467079
- Email:
- wcnvolunteers@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.