THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDWARD KING & MARTYR, CASTLE DONINGTON

Charity Number: 1210731
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST EDWARDS CHURCH CASTLE DONINGTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew James Race Chair 09 September 2024
None on record
Maria Catherine Imelda Laxton Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
APRIL ISABEL SLY Trustee 10 May 2023
DERBY GRAMMAR SCHOOL PTA
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MARY MANDEVILLE Trustee 10 May 2018
ENGAGENET LTD
Received: On time
Angela Parkes Trustee 10 April 2018
CASTLE DONINGTON MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Linda Jaqueline Oaten Trustee
None on record
Shirley Niccolete Swanepoel Trustee
None on record
Ann Newton Trustee
None on record
John Richard Laxton Trustee
None on record
Rev Matthew Hague Green Trustee
None on record
Valerie Ann Ellett Trustee
None on record
Dewald Nienaber Swanepoel Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
The Church Office,
St Edward's Church Hall
Churchside Cottages
St Annes Lane Castle Donington
Derby DE74 2JH
DE74 2JH
Phone:
01332812708