EHSL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EHSL provides supported housing accommodation and associated services to people with learning disabilities, mental health issues, autism, and other support needs.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 December 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hon | Chair | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Slater | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Lewis | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wilson | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2024
Charitable objects
5.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING (OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF) HOUSING WITH ASSOCIATED SUPPORT, ADVOCACY, ADVICE, TRAINING, CARE, AND INFORMATION SERVICES RELATING TO THE PROVISION OF AND ACCESS TO SOCIAL HOUSING; AND (B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
E H S L
614 READING ROAD
WINNERSH
WOKINGHAM
RG41 5HE
- Phone:
- 03002004100
- Email:
- info@ehsl-uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.