1ST NORTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
local scouts group for young children in norton malton north yorkshire, covering many activities for the children to attain awards and badges
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 November 1965: Standard registration
- 1ST NORTON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Claire Bartlett | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Fothergill | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Dale | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Anne Gallon | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Wallis | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.37k | £4.87k | £14.94k | £15.09k | £27.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.09k | £13.16k | £14.45k | £13.43k | £16.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £625 | £1.13k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 12TH JULY 1965 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
1ST NORTON SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
NORTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 BURDALE CLOSE
NORTON
MALTON
YO17 9DG
- Phone:
- 01653694900
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window