HOPE FOR HERMIONE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope for Hermione's Primary purposes are; - For the advancement of education to raise awareness of Beta Propeller Accumulation Neurodegeneration (BPAN). - For the advancement of health and saving lives by raising funds to support research to find a cure for BPAN. - To provide support and services to individuals, families, caregivers and friends of those affected by BPAN.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Paton | Chair | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Bolton | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paton | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caryn de Nocker | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH BETA-PROPELLER PROTEIN-ASSOCIATED NEURODEGENERATION (BPAN) AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY: - GRANT FUNDING EXTERNAL ORGANISATIONS TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO ALL AREAS OF BPAN; - PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; - PROVIDING SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE ON LIVING WITH AND MANAGING BPAN; AND - EDUCATING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF BPAN AMONGST THE WIDER PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GORHAM DRIVE
DOWNSWOOD
MAIDSTONE
ME15 8UU
- Phone:
- +447974796672
- Email:
- info@hopeforhermione.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.