LEEDS COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding Leeds is a voluntary organisation providing activities to promote the education of girls and young women to help them develop emotionally, mentally, physically and spiritually so that they can make a positive contribution to their Community and wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1193 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING LEEDS (Working name)
- LEEDS COUNTY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- YORKSHIRE CENTRAL COUNTY (DIVISION) OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Ali | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Lisa Dainty-Wall | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isla Gerrard | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jayne Dilks | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE ESSLEMONT | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.23k | £58.96k | £53.66k | £87.55k | £106.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.05k | £81.26k | £68.97k | £132.92k | £105.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £20.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AND TO TAKE AN ACTIVE AND RESPONSIBLE ROLE IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
16a Morris Lane
Leeds
LS5 3JD
- Phone:
- 0113 274 7305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window