Governing document HABITATION OF PRAISE EVANGELISTIC MINISTRIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUL 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 DEC 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE AND CARRYING OUT WIDER OUTREACH WORK IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.