20th Harrogate Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Progressive development of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 February 1964: Standard registration
- 20TH HARROGATE SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 20TH HARROGATE BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Glover | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Thompson | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Pietrowski | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jackson | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Roslin | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Tricker | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hunt | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.30k | £13.00k | £23.28k | £18.48k | £32.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.47k | £7.77k | £24.34k | £15.79k | £26.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH JULY 1944 as amended on 22 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
20TH HARROGATE BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HARROGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 St Marys Walk
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG2 0LS
- Phone:
- 0796 2011803
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window