SHEFFIELD HISTORIC BUILDINGS TASKFORCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to restore and preserve historic buildings in Sheffield and bring them back into beneficial use.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 January 2025: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DEAN HOLMSHAW | Chair | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Tristram Broadwith | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peter Hollis | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karla Harrison CGMA | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Jane Ullathorne | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Gavin Jon Richards | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 14 MAY 2025
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND SHEFFIELD IN BUILDINGS AND OTHER PUBLIC AMENITIES INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING (AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST AND ANY WORKS OF ART OR OTHER ITEMS OF HISTORIC VALUE WITHIN THOSE BUILDINGS OR PUBLIC AMENITIES. (2) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
156 MURRAY ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S11 7GH
- Phone:
- 07521689538
- Email:
- SheffieldHBT@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.