6TH HOLME VALLEY (TRINITY CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group takes part in scouting activities organised by District County and National eg Camps, trips abroad. Awards and badges are gained. The group is run for the good of the young people in accordance with the Scout Association POR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- 6TH HOLME VALLEY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Kenneth Lane BEM | Chair | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Crowder | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Booth | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Finlayson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Marie Fairlie | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Palmer | Trustee | 06 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
Barry Suddick | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.47k | £33.25k | £32.89k | £38.64k | £25.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.37k | £13.33k | £33.50k | £38.81k | £36.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £8.00k | £5.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BOYS SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955 ASSIGNMEN DATED 8TH NOVEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
6TH HOLME VALLEY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
HOLME VALLEY, HUDDERSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6th Holme Valley Scout Group
Moorbottom
Honley
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 6DW
- Phone:
- 07757423797
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window