Trustees 6TH HOLME VALLEY (TRINITY CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 524744

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Kenneth Lane BEM | Chair | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Crowder | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Booth | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Finlayson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Marie Fairlie | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Palmer | Trustee | 06 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
Barry Suddick | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.