Trustees DOWNDERRY AND SEATON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1210090
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Slyfield Chair 21 March 2025
None on record
Julie Amanda Jaycock Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Jane Vanessa Mather Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Keith Roger Smith Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Geoffrey Lionel Toms Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Stephen John Morris Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Catherine Jane Jaycock Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Simon Paul Jaycock Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Lynne Angela Mends-Rees Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
David Geoffrey Ball Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
Mandy Christine Judy Smith Trustee 10 July 2018
None on record
Marion Oldor Candy Trustee 28 February 2014
None on record