BRAMHOPE SCOUT CAMP SITE
Charity number: 524761
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Leeds City
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 April 1970: Standard registration
- 05 January 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 January 2005: Funds transferred to 524828 CENTRAL YORKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BRAMHOPE SCOUT CAMPING GROUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AND CONVEYANCE DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1933 AND 17TH OCTOBER 1934. (ORDER DATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1969)
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE GOOD AND BENEFIT OF THE SCOUT MOVEMENT IN THE CITY OF LEEDS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CITY OF LEEDS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window