THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION - SHEFFIELD COUNTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity include but are not limited to: - holding regular meetings for Rainbows, Brownies, Guides and Senior Section members. - organising activity days and training events for girls and leaders; and - organising indoor and outdoor residential events both within the UK and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
756 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 October 1966: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING SHEFFIELD (Working name)
- COUNTY OF SHEFFIELD GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- COUNTY OF SHEFFIELD GUIDES (Previous name)
- SHEFFIELD LOCAL ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imogen Amelie Rhiannon Livingtston | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Brown | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Claire Hollingsworth | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Brown | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Todd | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judy Hulley | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Taylor | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.70k | £28.71k | £28.96k | £34.08k | £39.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.97k | £50.04k | £40.84k | £53.78k | £49.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2021 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 December 2021 | 411 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Girl Guiding Sheffield
41 Townhead Street
Sheffield
S1 2EB
- Phone:
- 01142725557
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window