74th Oak Street Scout Group.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Behind the fun of Scouting, there is an educational programme that was completely redesigned in 2001 following years of work with educationalists and youth workers. While each Group will undertake different activities, the main programme areas are: outdoor and adventure; global; community; fit for life; creative; and beliefs and attitudes. Group Leaders are trained to deliver this programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- 74TH SHEFFIELD (OAK STREET METHODIST) BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Louise Damon | Chair | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Rochester | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Lee Foster | Trustee | 06 October 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.99k | £15.64k | £24.13k | £34.12k | £46.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.54k | £18.85k | £21.50k | £37.44k | £37.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2023 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2023 | 739 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH DECEMBER 1959 as amended on 01 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
74TH SHEFFIELD (OAK STREET, METHODIST) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Hemsworth Road
Norton
Sheffield
S8 8LJ
- Phone:
- 07891809112
- Email:
- gsl@the74th.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window