Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ALL SAINTS HELMSLEY
Charity number: 1209878
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Melanie Burnside | Chair | 24 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Jake Barnaby Duncombe | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Katherine Anne Senior | Trustee | 25 August 2024 |
|
|||||
LUCY ANNE WILLSHAW | Trustee | 25 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Christine Curd | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Arthur Hallifax Sword | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|||||
ANNE MARY STEWART | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Adam Hiscocks | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ARTHUR GYTE | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Lindsay Jane Robinson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.