INVICTUS UK 2027 LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Invictus UK 2027 was established to deliver the Invictus Games and its legacy; supporting recovery for wounded, injured and sick service personnel. The 2027 edition has been awarded to Birmingham, UK, hosted at the NEC and organised by the Invictus Games UK 2027 Organising Committee. Over 550 participants from over 20 countries will take part in a week of sporting events and a cultural festival.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Gosling OBE | Chair | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul McCrudden | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Conneally | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir David Thompson QPM DL | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Jack Morgan Averty | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Martin Leslie Levermore MBE DL | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Allan Noon | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lt Gen Retd Richard Edward Nugee CB CVO CBE | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melloney Marina Caroline Poole | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, RECOVERY AND REHABILITATION OF WOUNDED, INJURED AND SICK SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN, BOTH VETERAN AND SERVING, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY HOSTING AND DELIVERY OF THE INTERNATIONAL SPORTING COMPETITION KNOWN AS THE INVICTUS GAMES IN BIRMINGHAM IN 2027 FOR PARTICIPATING NATIONS WITH THE AIM OF: (I) ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY AND EQUALLY IN SOCIETY; AND (II) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO THE POSITION OF WOUNDED, INJURED AND SICK SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN, BOTH VETERAN AND SERVING, AND THE ROLE PLAYED BY THEIR FAMILIES. (B) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE BENEFIT OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN, BOTH VETERAN AND SERVING, AND THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS AND CARERS, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INVICTUS UK 2027 LIMITED
199 Borough High Street
LONDON
SE1 1AA
- Phone:
- 01217522441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.