CHHIPA WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chhipa Welfare Association is a well-known charitable organisation in Pakistan, founded by Ramzan Chhipa in 2007, that provides emergency and humanitarian services, particularly in Karachi but also nationwide. Their key services include a fleet of ambulances that respond to accidents, medical emergencies, and natural disasters, making it one of Karachi's most prominent emergency response networks.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Pakistan
Governance
- 25 October 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aurangzaib Shaikh | Chair | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Ramzan Chhipa | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ahmer Raza Chhipa | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Aslam Chhipa | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Faiz Khan | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hafiz Muhammad Tariq Shah | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
1.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES THROUGH GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS AFFECTED OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chhipa Welfare Association UK
23 LOCKETT STREET
MANCHESTER
M8 8EE
- Phone:
- 07590459775
- Email:
- info@chhipa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.