Financial history ANGLESEY GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 524842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.95k £27.78k £31.99k £29.98k £29.71k
Total expenditure £29.01k £29.45k £28.10k £41.57k £33.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.19k £13.23k £4.90k £2.50k