1st Saltney Ferry Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials. We provide activities and training for young people throughout Saltney and neighbouring villages. The group provides weekly meetings throughout the entire year, also a large number of events at weekends. The group caters for young people from 6 to 18 irrespective of disabilit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Flintshire
Governance
- 10 August 1966: Standard registration
- 1ST SALTNEY FERRY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 1ST SALTNEY FERRY SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP (Previous name)
- 1ST SALTNEY FERRY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Body | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Body | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eryl Gareth Williams | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Reynolds Mr | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Kealy | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARNOLD DOD BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79k | £20.94k | £24.24k | £39.13k | £51.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.14k | £10.15k | £33.52k | £22.92k | £67.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER, 1965 as amended on 25 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1ST SALTNEY FERRY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
EAST SALTNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Saltney Ferry Scout Group
Scout Hut
Bradshaw Avenue
Saltney Ferry
CHESTER
CH4 0BE
- Phone:
- 07761973020
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window