1ST BARRY SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 24 February 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST BARRY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Eileen Salhab | Chair | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rizik Joseph Salhab | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Luca Howels | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Sutton | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Horbury | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Simpkins | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Horbury | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard James | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Phillips | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.26k | £45.74k | £28.82k | £35.55k | £46.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.76k | £42.46k | £26.81k | £45.45k | £53.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | £15.00k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2021 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2021 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 11TH DECEMBER 1959 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 155
Charitable objects
1ST BARRY SEA SCOUTS GROUP
Area of benefit
BARRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 PORTH-Y-CASTELL
BARRY
CF62 6QE
- Phone:
- 01446404829
- Email:
- group@1stbarry.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window