2ND CAERPHILLY BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training young people between ages of 6years to 14 years in accordance with the Scout Association's policy organisation and rules. These activities pursued in the Caerphilly area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 14 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Charles Body | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Williams | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE PHYLLIS ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN HUMPHREYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.50k | £15.16k | £6.87k | £14.10k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.97k | £7.68k | £8.03k | £11.21k | £12.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1963
Charitable objects
2ND CAERPHILLY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
CAERPHILLY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 Heol y Ddol
Caerphilly
CF83 3JN
- Phone:
- 02920865935
- Email:
- easterbrook2@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window